IL HR0004 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-12 - Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-12 - Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Acknowledges that toxic stress and adverse childhood experiences can have significantly negative short-term, long-term, and generational impacts and that early interventions through trauma-informed care is the most efficient and cost effective way to combat these impacts. Urges the Illinois General Assembly to seek out opportunities to enhance legislation through the science of resiliency and a trauma informed lens and funding around early intervention services for children and families that centers the principles of brain development, the intimate connection between mental and physical health, and the concepts of toxic stress and adverse childhood experiences.
Title
TOXIC STRESS-CHILDHOOD
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-12 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2021-05-12 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason |
2021-05-12 | House | Resolution Adopted |
2021-05-06 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2021-05-06 | House | Recommends Be Adopted as Amended Mental Health & Addiction Committee; 016-000-000 |
2021-05-06 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Mental Health & Addiction Committee; by Voice Vote |
2021-05-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2021-05-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2021-05-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard |
2021-05-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2021-05-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2021-05-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller |
2021-05-06 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz |
2021-05-06 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Aaron M. Ortiz |
2021-04-13 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Mental Health & Addiction Committee |
2021-04-08 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-04-08 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Maurice A. West, II |
2021-03-16 | House | Assigned to Mental Health & Addiction Committee |
2021-01-14 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-01-13 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Maurice A. West, II |