IL HJRCA0050 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Proposes to amend the General Provisions Article of the Illinois Constitution. Provides that only a union of one man and one woman shall be valid or recognized as a marriage in this State. Provides that this State and its political subdivisions shall not create or recognize a legal status similar to that of marriage. Effective upon being declared adopted.
Title
CON AMEND-MARRIAGE
Sponsors
Rep. David Reis [R] | Rep. Thomas Morrison [R] | Rep. Brad Halbrook [R] | Rep. Mike Bost [R] |
Rep. Wayne Rosenthal [R] | Rep. Adam Brown [R] | Rep. John Cavaletto [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2012-09-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John D. Cavaletto |
2012-08-16 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2012-08-16 | House | Read in Full a First Time |
2012-07-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Adam Brown |
2012-07-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Wayne Rosenthal |
2012-07-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Bost |
2012-07-27 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Brad E. Halbrook |
2012-07-23 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas Morrison |
2012-07-16 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. David Reis |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=50&GAID=11&DocTypeID=HJRCA&SessionID=84&GA=97 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/97/HJRCA/09700HC0050.htm |