IL HJRCA0047 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Proposes to amend the Bill of Rights Article of the Illinois Constitution. Provides that no law shall be passed on or after the effective date of the Constitutional Amendment that prohibits the ability of workers to join together and collectively bargain over wages, hours, and terms and conditions of employment through a representative of their own choosing, including any law that prohibits the right of private sector employers and employees to enter into and administer union-security agreements. Allows the General Assembly to establish reasonable amendments to existing law and establish reasonable exemptions relating to collective bargaining rights. Effective upon being declared adopted.
Title
CON AMEND-WORKERS' RIGHTS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-05-20 | House | Assigned to Labor & Commerce Committee |
2020-05-18 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-05-18 | House | Read in Full a First Time |
2020-05-05 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=47&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HJRCA&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HJRCA/10100HC0047.htm |