IL HJRCA0047 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 27-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-05 - Tabled Pursuant to Rule 46
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-05 - Tabled Pursuant to Rule 46
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Proposes to amend the Executive Article of the Illinois Constitution. Eliminates the Office of the Comptroller. Provides that the Treasurer shall (i) maintain the State's central fiscal accounts and order payments into and out of the funds held by him or her, (ii) be responsible for the safekeeping and investment of monies and securities deposited with him or her, and for their disbursement upon his or her order, and (iii) have the duties and powers that may be prescribed by law. Effective upon being declared adopted, and applies upon conclusion of the terms of the Comptroller and Treasurer elected in 2010.
Title
EXEC-ABOLISH COMPTROLLER
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-05 | House | Tabled Pursuant to Rule 46 |
2012-05-01 | House | Motion Discharge Committee Lost by Voice Vote |
2012-05-01 | House | Chair Rules Motion Lost |
2012-05-01 | House | Objects to Motion Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2012-04-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock |
2012-04-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Fortner |
2012-04-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David Reis |
2012-04-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ed Sullivan, Jr. |
2012-04-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rosemary Mulligan |
2012-04-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sandy Cole |
2012-04-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine Hammond |
2012-04-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Bill Mitchell |
2012-04-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Winters |
2012-04-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Adam Brown |
2012-04-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Wayne Rosenthal |
2012-04-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John D. Cavaletto |
2012-04-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dwight Kay |
2012-04-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry L. Mitchell |
2012-04-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rich Brauer |
2012-04-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Richard Morthland |
2012-04-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Chapin Rose |
2012-04-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Unes |
2012-04-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brad E. Halbrook |
2012-04-26 | House | Motion Filed to Discharge Rules Committee Rep. Dennis M. Reboletti |
2012-02-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David Harris |
2012-02-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Bost |
2012-02-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kay Hatcher |
2012-02-24 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jason Barickman |
2012-02-24 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kent Gaffney |
2012-02-24 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas Morrison |
2012-02-24 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Ren |
2012-02-16 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2012-02-16 | House | Read in Full a First Time |
2012-02-16 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Sidney H. Mathias |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=47&GAID=11&DocTypeID=HJRCA&SessionID=84&GA=97 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/97/HJRCA/09700HC0047.htm |