IL HJRCA0046 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-06 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-06 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Proposes to amend the Legislature Article of the Illinois Constitution. Prohibits a person from holding the office of State Senator or State Representative, or a combination of those offices, for more than 10 years. Effective upon being declared adopted.
Title
GA MEMBERS-TERM LIMITS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-06 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2016-02-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed |
2016-01-22 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-01-22 | House | Read in Full a First Time |
2016-01-21 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Dwight Kay |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=46&GAID=13&DocTypeID=HJRCA&SessionID=88&GA=99 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/HJRCA/09900HC0046.htm |