IL HJRCA0043 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 33-2)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 33-2)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Proposes to amend the Legislature Article of the Illinois Constitution. Provides that provisions concerning legislative redistricting apply to Congressional Districts. Requires that districts, in addition to being compact, contiguous, and substantially equal in population, must also comply with the federal Constitution and law, provide racial and ethnic minorities with equal opportunity to participate in the political process, provide racial and ethnic minorities who constitute less than a voting-age majority of a district with an opportunity to substantially influence the outcome of an election, respect geographic integrity of units of local government, respect communities sharing common social or economic interests, and not discriminate against or in favor of any political party or individual. Replaces the current method of legislative redistricting with the following: a 16-member commission, appointed by the Chief Justice of the Supreme Court and the most senior Supreme Court Judge of a different political party in accordance with specified criteria, shall adopt and file with the Secretary of State redistricting plans for Legislative, Representative, and Congressional Districts following a series of public hearings by August 1 of the year following a federal decennial census; permits the public to submit maps during the map drawing process for consideration by the Commission; and, if a redistricting plan is not adopted by August 1 of the year following a federal decennial census, then a seventeenth member shall be appointed to the Commission and redistricting plans shall be filed by September 1. Adds provisions concerning the membership of the Commission and budgetary matters related to the Commission. Removes the requirement for each Legislative District to be divided into two Representative Districts. Effective upon being declared adopted and applicable to redistricting beginning in 2021 and to the election of General Assembly members beginning in 2022.
Title
CON AMEND-REDISTRICTING
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2018-08-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jeff Keicher |
2018-07-02 | House | Rule 19(b) / Motion Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David Harris |
2018-05-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David S. Olsen |
2018-05-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Allen Skillicorn |
2018-05-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brad Halbrook |
2018-05-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie |
2018-05-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Christine Winger |
2018-04-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas Morrison |
2018-04-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith R. Wheeler |
2018-04-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello |
2018-04-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Nick Sauer |
2018-04-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick |
2018-04-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin |
2018-04-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant |
2018-04-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Wojcicki Jimenez |
2018-04-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David A. Welter |
2018-04-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David B. Reis |
2018-04-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Randy E. Frese |
2018-04-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. C.D. Davidsmeyer |
2018-04-17 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2018-04-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Avery Bourne |
2018-04-11 | House | Motion Filed to Discharge Rules Committee Rep. Ryan Spain |
2018-04-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith P. Sommer |
2018-04-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven A. Andersson |
2018-04-04 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Sente |
2018-04-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed |
2018-04-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2018-04-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2018-04-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Swanson |
2018-04-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond |
2018-04-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Lee Long |
2018-04-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Chad Hays |
2018-04-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas M. Bennett |
2018-04-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tim Butler |
2018-04-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David McSweeney |
2018-04-03 | House | Remove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas M. Bennett |
2018-04-03 | House | Remove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Tim Butler |
2018-04-03 | House | Remove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David McSweeney |
2018-03-27 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas M. Bennett |
2018-03-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli |
2018-03-12 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Tim Butler |
2018-03-09 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David McSweeney |
2018-02-27 | House | Remove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli |
2018-02-27 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-02-27 | House | Read in Full a First Time |
2018-02-27 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael D. Unes |
2018-02-27 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli |
2018-02-26 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Ryan Spain |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=43&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HJRCA&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HJRCA/10000HC0043.htm |