IL HJRCA0041 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Introduced on July 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-08-22 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on July 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-08-22 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Proposes to amend the Legislature and Executive Articles of the Illinois Constitution. Provides that a person may not be elected to the office of State Senator or State Representative, or a combination of those offices, for terms totaling more than 10 years; service before the second Wednesday in January of 2017 shall not be considered in the calculation of a person's service. Provides that a person may not be elected to any Executive Branch office, or any combination of Executive Branch offices, for terms totaling more than 8 years; service before the second Monday in January of 2017 shall not be considered in the calculation of a person's service. Effective upon being declared adopted.
Title
CON AMEND-TERM LIMITS
Sponsors
Rep. James Durkin [R] | Rep. Joe Sosnowski [R] | Rep. Bill Mitchell [R] | Rep. Dwight Kay [R] |
Rep. Anthony DeLuca [D] | Rep. Patricia Bellock [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-08-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock |
2016-08-12 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dwight Kay |
2016-08-03 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Bill Mitchell |
2016-05-06 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2015-08-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca |
2015-08-12 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John D. Anthony |
2015-07-21 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-07-21 | House | Read in Full a First Time |
2015-07-09 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Joe Sosnowski |
2015-07-08 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jim Durkin |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=41&GAID=13&DocTypeID=HJRCA&SessionID=88&GA=99 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/HJRCA/09900HC0041.htm |