IL HJRCA0037 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 21 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-06 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 21 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-06 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Proposes to amend the Judiciary Article of the Illinois Constitution. Provides maximum dollar value limitations on specified categories of damages.
Title
CONAMEND-LIABILITY LIMITS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-06 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2016-01-03 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2015-05-27 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2015-05-27 | House | Read in Full a Second Time |
2015-05-27 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2015-05-27 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Civil Committee; 011-000-000 |
2015-05-21 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2015-05-21 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-05-21 | House | Read in Full a First Time |
2015-05-21 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=37&GAID=13&DocTypeID=HJRCA&SessionID=88&GA=99 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/HJRCA/09900HC0037.htm |