IL HJRCA0034 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on May 3 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-07-18 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Proposes to amend the Bill of Rights Article of the Illinois Constitution. Provides that employees shall have the fundamental right to organize and to bargain collectively through representatives of their own choosing for the purpose of negotiating wages, hours, and working conditions, and to protect their economic welfare and safety at work. Provides that no law shall be passed that interferes with, negates, or diminishes the right of employees to organize and bargain collectively over their wages, hours, and other terms and conditions of employment and work place safety, including any law or ordinance that prohibits the execution or application of agreements between employers and labor organizations that represent employees requiring membership in an organization as a condition of employment. Provides that these provisions are controlling over home rule powers. Effective upon being declared adopted.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CON AMEND-WORKERS' RIGHTS

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-07-18HouseRule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2021-05-24HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lance Yednock
2021-05-24HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley
2021-05-20HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2021-05-19HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Labor & Commerce Committee; 021-003-001
2021-05-11HouseAssigned to Labor & Commerce Committee
2021-05-04HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2021-05-04HouseRead in Full a First Time
2021-05-03HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2021-05-03HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback