IL HJRCA0033 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-07-18 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Proposes to amend the Revenue Article of the Illinois Constitution. Provides that the aggregate real property tax rate imposed on a particular property by a county or other taxing district shall not exceed 1.5% of the fair market value of that property unless the voters of the taxing district approve an increase above the 1.5% rate by three-fifths of the registered voters in the taxing district. Effective upon being declared adopted.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CONAMEND-PROPERTY TAX

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-07-18HouseRule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2021-04-14HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2021-04-06HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2021-04-06HouseRead in Full a First Time
2021-03-29HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. David A. Welter

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback