IL HJRCA0031 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 10 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-07-18 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Proposes to amend the Suffrage and Elections Article of the Illinois Constitution. Repeals language denying a person convicted of a felony, or otherwise under sentence in a correctional institution or jail, the right to vote until completion of his or her sentence. Effective upon being declared adopted.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CON AMEND-FELON VOTING

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-07-18HouseRule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2021-04-14HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2021-03-11HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2021-03-11HouseRead in Full a First Time
2021-03-10HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback