IL HJRCA0030 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 5 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-07-18 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Proposes to amend the Constitutional Revision Article of the Illinois Constitution. Provides that amendments to specified provisions of the Constitution concerning statements of economic interests may be proposed by petition. Provides that such amendments shall be limited to establishing and enforcing stronger ethical standards for candidates for or office holders of: (i) State office; (ii) offices in units of local government and school districts; and (iii) membership of a Commission or Board created by the Constitution. Makes conforming changes. Effective upon being declared adopted.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CON AMEND-INITIATIVE PETITION

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-07-18HouseRule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2021-04-14HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2021-03-09HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2021-03-09HouseRead in Full a First Time
2021-03-05HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Maurice A. West, II

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback