IL HJRCA0029 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Introduced on February 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-03 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Ugaste
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-03 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Ugaste
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Legislature Article of the Illinois Constitution. Provides that any bill voted upon in either house on or after January 1, but prior to the beginning of a new session of the General Assembly on the second Wednesday in January, in odd-numbered years, shall pass only by a three-fifths majority vote of the members elected to each house. Effective upon being declared adopted.
Title
CON AMEND-LAME DUCK SESSION
Sponsors
Rep. Keith Wheeler [R] | Rep. Adam Niemerg [R] | Rep. Ryan Spain [R] | Rep. Martin McLaughlin [R] |
Rep. Tony McCombie [R] | Rep. Jeff Keicher [R] | Rep. Chris Bos [R] | Rep. Dan Ugaste [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Ugaste |
2021-07-18 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2021-03-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Chris Bos |
2021-03-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jeff Keicher |
2021-03-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie |
2021-03-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin McLaughlin |
2021-03-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain |
2021-03-16 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2021-03-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Adam Niemerg |
2021-02-22 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-02-22 | House | Read in Full a First Time |
2021-02-19 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Keith R. Wheeler |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=29&GAID=16&DocTypeID=HJRCA&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/HJRCA/10200HC0029.htm |