IL HJRCA0027 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 19 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-07-18 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Proposes to amend the Finance Article of the Illinois Constitution. Provides that the General Assembly shall pass a balanced budget that makes appropriations based on funds estimated to be available by the Commission on Government Forecasting and Accountability. Effective upon being declared adopted.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CONAMEND-BALANCED BUDGET

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-07-18HouseRule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2021-06-11HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Avery Bourne
2021-03-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain
2021-03-16HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2021-02-22HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2021-02-22HouseRead in Full a First Time
2021-02-19HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Amy Elik

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback