IL HJRCA0024 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 19 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-07-18 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Proposes to amend the Legislature Article of the Illinois Constitution. Prohibits a person from holding the office of State Senator or State Representative or a combination of those offices for more than 20 years; provided that service before the second Wednesday in January of 2019 shall not be considered in the calculation of a person's service. Proposes to amend the Executive Article of the Illinois Constitution. Prohibits an executive branch officer from serving more than 2 consecutive terms in the same executive branch office. Effective upon being declared adopted. Applies to the election of executive branch officers in 2022 and thereafter.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

GA & EXECUTIVE-TERM LIMITS

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-07-18HouseRule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2021-03-16HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2021-02-22HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2021-02-22HouseRead in Full a First Time
2021-02-19HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Joe Sosnowski

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback