IL HJRCA0023 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on February 19 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-07-18 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Proposes to amend the Bill of Rights Article of the Illinois Constitution. Provides that no law shall be passed on or after the effective date of the Constitutional Amendment that prohibits the ability of workers to join together and collectively bargain over wages, hours, and terms and conditions of employment through a representative of their own choosing, including any law that prohibits the right of private sector employers and employees to enter into and administer union-security agreements. Allows the General Assembly to establish reasonable amendments to existing law and establish reasonable exemptions relating to collective bargaining rights. Effective upon being declared adopted.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CON AMEND-WORKERS' RIGHTS

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-07-18HouseRule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2021-04-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard
2021-04-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2021-04-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer
2021-04-22HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley
2021-03-16HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2021-03-09HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr.
2021-02-22HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2021-02-22HouseRead in Full a First Time
2021-02-19HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Lance Yednock

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback