IL HJRCA0022 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-07-18 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Legislature Article of the Illinois Constitution. Provides that only bills that have been vetoed by the Governor may be voted upon during regular session of the General Assembly that is held after May 31 of an even-numbered year and prior to the beginning of a new session of the General Assembly on the second Wednesday in January of an odd-numbered year. Provides that a special session of the General Assembly may be convened for emergency purposes at which subjects other than bills vetoed by the Governor may be considered. Effective upon being declared adopted.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CON AMEND-LAME DUCK VETOES

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-07-18HouseRule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2021-03-16HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2021-02-22HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2021-02-22HouseRead in Full a First Time
2021-02-18HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Thomas Morrison

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback