IL HJRCA0020 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-07-18 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Proposes to amend the General Provisions Article of the Illinois Constitution. Removes language that provides that membership in any pension or retirement system of the State, any unit of local government or school district, or any agency or instrumentality thereof, shall be an enforceable contractual relationship, the benefits of which shall not be diminished or impaired. Provides that membership in any pension or retirement system of the State, any unit of local government or school district, or any agency or instrumentality thereof is limited to persons who first became members of that pension or retirement system before January 1, 2023. Provides that a person who was not a member of a pension or retirement system of the State, any unit of local government or school district, or any agency or instrumentality thereof before January 1, 2023 may not become a member of such pension or retirement system on or after January 1, 2023. Provides that the State, any unit of local government or school district, or any agency or instrumentality thereof may not establish a pension or retirement system after January 1, 2023. Effective upon being declared adopted.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CONAMEND-PENSION RIGHTS

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-07-18HouseRule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2021-03-16HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2021-02-22HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2021-02-22HouseRead in Full a First Time
2021-02-18HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Adam Niemerg

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback