IL HJRCA0018 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Proposes to amend the General Provisions Article of the Illinois Constitution. Repeals a provision that specifies that membership in any pension or retirement system of the State, any unit of local government or school district, or any agency or instrumentality thereof shall be an enforceable contractual relationship, the benefits of which shall not be diminished or impaired. Effective upon being declared adopted.
Title
CONAMEND-REPEAL PENSION RIGHTS
Sponsors
Rep. Joe Sosnowski [R] | Rep. Jeanne Ives [R] | Rep. Thomas Morrison [R] | Rep. Allen Skillicorn [R] |
Rep. Jerry Long [R] | Rep. Ryan Spain [R] | Rep. Grant Wehrli [R] | Rep. Margo McDermed [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2017-04-28 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Reginald Phillips |
2017-04-04 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven A. Andersson |
2017-03-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed |
2017-02-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli |
2017-02-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Reginald Phillips |
2017-02-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven A. Andersson |
2017-02-23 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Lee Long |
2017-02-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain |
2017-02-23 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Allen Skillicorn |
2017-02-22 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas Morrison |
2017-02-22 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jeanne M Ives |
2017-01-27 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-01-27 | House | Read in Full a First Time |
2017-01-26 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Joe Sosnowski |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=18&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HJRCA&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HJRCA/10000HC0018.htm |