IL HJRCA0017 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-1)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-08-16 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jeff Keicher
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Proposes to amend the Legislature Article of the Illinois Constitution. Creates the Independent Redistricting Commission to adopt and file with the Secretary of State a redistricting plan for Legislative and Representative Districts. Provides for the selection of Commissioners and establishes the authority of a Special Commissioner to design a redistricting plan in the event that the Commission fails to properly adopt and file a redistricting plan. Effective beginning with redistricting in 2021 and applies to members elected in 2022 and thereafter.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CONAMEND-LEGISLATIVE REDISTRCT

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jeff Keicher
2018-08-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Deanne M. Mazzochi
2017-03-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas M. Bennett
2017-03-21HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Reginald Phillips
2017-03-15HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Demmer
2017-03-15HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Wheeler
2017-03-15HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Tim Butler
2017-02-08HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Martwick
2017-01-27HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsay Parkhurst
2017-01-25HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-01-25HouseRead in Full a First Time
2017-01-25HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Jim Durkin

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback