IL HJRCA0013 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-02 - Tabled Pursuant to Rule 46
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-02 - Tabled Pursuant to Rule 46
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Proposes to amend Section 1 of Article X of the Illinois Constitution. Provides that a fundamental right (instead of goal) of the People of the State is the educational development of all persons to the limits of their capacities. Provides that it is the paramount duty of the State to provide for a thorough and efficient system of high quality public education institutions and services and to guarantee equality of educational opportunity as a fundamental right of each citizen (instead of requiring the State to provide for an efficient system of high quality public education institutions and services). Provides that the State has the preponderant financial responsibility (instead of the primary responsibility) for financing the system of public education. Effective upon being declared adopted in accordance with Section 7 of the Illinois Constitutional Amendment Act.
Title
CON AMEND-EDUCATION FUNDING
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-02 | Tabled Pursuant to Rule 46 | |
2009-08-16 | Rule 19(b) / Motion Referred to Rules Committee; (Motion to Discharge Committee) | |
2009-03-24 | Motion Filed to Discharge Rules Committee Rep. William B. Black | |
2009-02-19 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Luis Arroyo | |
2009-02-19 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Cynthia Soto | |
2009-02-11 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kenneth Dunkin | |
2009-02-09 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-02-09 | Read in Full a First Time | |
2009-02-09 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. William B. Black |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=13&GAID=10&DocTypeID=HJRCA&SessionID=76&GA=96 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/96/HJRCA/09600HC0013.htm |