IL HJRCA0010 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 34-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-02 - Tabled Pursuant to Rule 46
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-02 - Tabled Pursuant to Rule 46
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Proposes to amend the Suffrage and Elections Article of the Illinois Constitution. Provides for elections to recall State executive branch officers and members of the General Assembly. Provides for successor elections to fill the vacant term of a recalled officer or member. Provides for petitions to be filed with the State Board of Elections and sets requirements for petitions. Provides for the State Board of Elections to proclaim the election and set the date. Provides for objections to petitions. Provides that the recall provisions are self-executing and judicially enforceable. Effective upon being declared adopted.
Title
CONAMEND-RECALL ELECTIONS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-02 | Tabled Pursuant to Rule 46 | |
2009-05-26 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark H. Beaubien, Jr. | |
2009-05-26 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rich Brauer | |
2009-05-26 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock | |
2009-05-26 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John D. Cavaletto | |
2009-05-26 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Coulson | |
2009-05-26 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kay Hatcher | |
2009-05-26 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ron Stephens | |
2009-05-26 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Richard P. Myers | |
2009-05-26 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Suzanne Bassi | |
2009-05-26 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David Reis | |
2009-05-26 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Bill Mitchell | |
2009-05-26 | Motion to Sustain the Chair - Prevailed 061-047-000 | |
2009-05-26 | Shall the Chair be Sustained | |
2009-05-26 | Appeal Ruling of Chair Rep. William B. Black | |
2009-05-26 | Motion Discharge Committee Lost | |
2009-05-26 | Chair Rules Motion Lost | |
2009-05-26 | Objects to Motion Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie | |
2009-05-26 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael W. Tryon | |
2009-05-26 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Darlene J. Senger | |
2009-05-26 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Timothy L. Schmitz | |
2009-05-26 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sandy Cole | |
2009-05-26 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sandra M. Pihos | |
2009-05-26 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Winters | |
2009-05-26 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Brady | |
2009-05-26 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Raymond Poe | |
2009-05-26 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. JoAnn D. Osmond | |
2009-05-26 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jil Tracy | |
2009-05-26 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Donald L. Moffitt | |
2009-05-26 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith P. Sommer | |
2009-05-26 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry L. Mitchell | |
2009-05-26 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Randy Ramey, Jr. | |
2009-05-26 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jim Sacia | |
2009-05-26 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dennis M. Reboletti | |
2009-05-26 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert W. Pritchard | |
2009-05-26 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Fortner | |
2009-05-26 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Renée Kosel | |
2009-05-26 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Cross | |
2009-05-18 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael G. Connelly | |
2009-03-24 | Motion Filed to Discharge Rules Committee Rep. William B. Black | |
2009-02-25 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sidney H. Mathias | |
2009-02-04 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-02-04 | Read in Full a First Time | |
2009-02-04 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. William B. Black |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=10&GAID=10&DocTypeID=HJRCA&SessionID=76&GA=96 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/96/HJRCA/09600HC0010.htm |