IL HJRCA0009 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-12-10 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Andrew S. Chesney
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Proposes to amend the Legislature and Executive Articles of the Illinois Constitution. Provides that a person may not be elected to the office of State Senator or State Representative, or a combination of those offices, for terms totalling more than 10 years; service before the second Wednesday in January of 2019 shall not be considered in the calculation of a person's service. Provides that a person may not be elected to any Executive Branch office, or any combination of Executive Branch offices, for terms totalling more than 8 years; service before the second Monday in January of 2019 shall not be considered in the calculation of a person's service.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CON AMEND-TERM LIMITS

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-12-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Andrew S. Chesney
2018-08-07HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Deanne M. Mazzochi
2017-01-27HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsay Parkhurst
2017-01-13HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Tim Butler
2017-01-11HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-01-11HouseRead in Full a First Time
2017-01-11HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Jim Durkin

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback