IL HJRCA0008 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 17 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-29 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy Grant
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 17 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-29 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy Grant
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Proposes to amend the Right to Arms provision of the Illinois Constitution. Provides that subject only to the police power, in addition to the right of the individual citizen to keep and bear arms, the individual citizen has the right to carry firearms. Effective upon being declared adopted.
Title
BILL OF RIGHTS-CARRY FIREARMS
Sponsors
Rep. Adam Niemerg [R] | Rep. Amy Grant [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy Grant |
2021-07-18 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2021-03-16 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2021-02-17 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-02-17 | House | Read in Full a First Time |
2021-02-17 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Adam Niemerg |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=8&GAID=16&DocTypeID=HJRCA&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/HJRCA/10200HC0008.htm |