IL HJRCA0007 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 17 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-07-18 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Proposes to amend the Bill of Rights Article of the Illinois Constitution. Provides that the right to reproductive healthcare is a fundamental right held by all citizens. Further specifies rights concerning reproductive healthcare. Effective upon being declared adopted.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CON AMEND-REPRODUCTIVE HEALTH

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-07-18HouseRule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2021-05-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
2021-03-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason
2021-03-17HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Janet Yang Rohr
2021-03-16HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2021-02-17HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2021-02-17HouseRead in Full a First Time
2021-02-17HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Barbara Hernandez

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback