IL HJRCA0006 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-07-18 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Legislature Article of the Illinois Constitution. Provides for a referendum to reject any Public Act by a petition signed by a number of electors. Provides signature and content requirements for the petition. Provides requirements for the validity and sufficiency of petitions. Provides that if a petition is valid and sufficient, the proposed referendum shall be submitted to the electors at the general election specified in the petition. Provides that if the voters in a specified election reject a Public Act, it shall cease to be in effect on the date specified in the referendum. Effective upon being declared adopted.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CON AMEND-REF ON LEGISLATION

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-07-18HouseRule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2021-03-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin McLaughlin
2021-03-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie
2021-03-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain
2021-03-16HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2021-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas Morrison
2021-02-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Tim Ozinga
2021-02-11HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick Windhorst
2021-02-08HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2021-02-08HouseRead in Full a First Time
2021-02-08HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Chris Bos
2021-02-08HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Ugaste
2021-02-04HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Brad Halbrook
2021-02-02HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Mark Batinick

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback