IL HJRCA0005 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-29 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy Grant
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-29 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy Grant
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Constitutional Revision Article of the Illinois Constitution. Provides that amendments to the Illinois Constitution (currently, Article IV of the Constitution only) may be proposed by a petition signed by a number of electors equal in number to at least eight percent of the total votes cast for candidates for Governor in the preceding gubernatorial election. Provides that the initiative process shall not be used for the proposal, modification, or repeal of any portion of the Bill of Rights of the Constitution or to modify the initiative process for proposing amendments to the Constitution. Makes conforming changes. Effective upon being declared adopted.
Title
CON AMEND-CITIZEN INITIATIVE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy Grant |
2021-07-18 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2021-03-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin McLaughlin |
2021-03-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain |
2021-03-16 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2021-02-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas M. Bennett |
2021-02-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tim Ozinga |
2021-02-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick Windhorst |
2021-02-08 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-02-08 | House | Read in Full a First Time |
2021-02-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Chris Bos |
2021-02-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Ugaste |
2021-02-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brad Halbrook |
2021-02-02 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Mark Batinick |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=5&GAID=16&DocTypeID=HJRCA&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/HJRCA/10200HC0005.htm |