IL HJRCA0004 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-07-18 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Proposes to amend the Suffrage and Elections Article of the Illinois Constitution. Provides for the recall of all State Executive Branch officers, legislative leaders, the Auditor General, members of the General Assembly, and local government officials. Makes changes to the procedures for the recall of the Governor. Effective upon being declared adopted.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CONAMEND-RECALL OFFICIALS

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-07-18HouseRule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2021-03-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin McLaughlin
2021-03-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie
2021-03-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain
2021-03-16HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2021-02-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas M. Bennett
2021-02-11HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick Windhorst
2021-02-08HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Chris Bos
2021-02-08HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Ugaste
2021-02-04HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Brad Halbrook
2021-01-29HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2021-01-29HouseRead in Full a First Time
2021-01-28HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Mark Batinick

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback