IL HJR0143 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on November 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-11-15 - Adopted Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

RESOLVED, BY THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES OF THE ONE HUNDREDTH GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF THE STATE OF ILLINOIS, THE SENATE CONCURRING HEREIN, that when the two Houses adjourn on Thursday, November 15, 2018, the House of Representatives stands adjourned until Tuesday, November 27, 2018, or until the call of the Speaker; and the Senate stands adjourned until Tuesday, November 27, 2018, or until the call of the President.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

ADJOURN HOUSE & SENATE

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-11-15HouseAdopted Both Houses
2018-11-15SenateResolution Adopted
2018-11-15SenatePrevailed to Suspend Rule 3-6(a)
2018-11-15SenateMoved to Suspend Rule Sen. John J. Cullerton; 3-6(a)
2018-11-15SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. John J. Cullerton
2018-11-15SenateArrive in Senate
2018-11-14HouseResolution Adopted
2018-11-14HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback