IL HJR0141 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Introduced on September 17 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-10-11 - Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Urges the creation via legislation of the Illinois Commission on Fiscal Responsibility and Reform, whose purpose shall be to examine the extent to which current practices of the executive agencies either conform to or fall short of established laws, regulations and best practices, and to determine the fiscal impact which the State realizes as a result of falling short of compliance with such practices.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

COMMISSION ON FISCAL REFORM

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-10-11HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers
2018-10-11HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Allen Skillicorn
2018-10-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas Morrison
2018-10-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli
2018-09-20HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Peter Breen
2018-09-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven A. Andersson
2018-09-17HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Steven Reick

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback