IL HJR0141 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urges the creation via legislation of the Illinois Commission on Fiscal Responsibility and Reform, whose purpose shall be to examine the extent to which current practices of the executive agencies either conform to or fall short of established laws, regulations and best practices, and to determine the fiscal impact which the State realizes as a result of falling short of compliance with such practices.
Title
COMMISSION ON FISCAL REFORM
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2018-11-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jeff Keicher |
2018-11-13 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-10-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed |
2018-10-11 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2018-10-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Allen Skillicorn |
2018-10-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas Morrison |
2018-10-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli |
2018-09-20 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Peter Breen |
2018-09-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven A. Andersson |
2018-09-17 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Steven Reick |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=141&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HJR&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HJR/10000HJ0141.htm |