IL HJR0138 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urges Congress to adopt anew the ERA, with the common-sense abortion-neutral language of Congressman Sensenbrenner, and send it to the states for ratification.
Title
NEW ERA-ADOPT
Sponsors
Rep. Sara Jimenez [R] | Rep. Nicholas Sauer [R] | Rep. Norine Hammond [R] | Rep. Tom Demmer [R] |
Rep. Ryan Spain [R] | Rep. Avery Bourne [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2018-06-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Avery Bourne |
2018-05-31 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain |
2018-05-31 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Demmer |
2018-05-31 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond |
2018-05-31 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Nick Sauer |
2018-05-31 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-30 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Sara Wojcicki Jimenez |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=138&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HJR&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HJR/10000HJ0138.htm |