IL HJR0133 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Designates the entirety of Illinois Route 390 as the "Illinois Bicentennial Memorial Tollway" in recognition of our States 200th birthday.
Title
ILL BICENTENNIAL TOLLWAY
Sponsors
Rep. Michelle Mussman [D] | Rep. Timothy Butler [R] | Rep. Robert Rita [D] | Rep. Nicholas Sauer [R] |
Rep. David Olsen [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2018-07-02 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David S. Olsen |
2018-05-24 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2018-05-24 | House | Recommends Be Adopted Tollway Oversight Committee; 003-000-000 |
2018-05-18 | House | Assigned to Tollway Oversight Committee |
2018-05-17 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Tim Butler |
2018-05-15 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Nick Sauer |
2018-05-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Rita |
2018-05-14 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michelle Mussman |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=133&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HJR&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HJR/10000HJ0133.htm |