IL HJR0133 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on May 14 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-05-25 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David S. Olsen
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Designates the entirety of Illinois Route 390 as the "Illinois Bicentennial Memorial Tollway" in recognition of our States 200th birthday.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

ILL BICENTENNIAL TOLLWAY

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. David S. Olsen
2018-05-24HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Resolutions
2018-05-24HouseRecommends Be Adopted Tollway Oversight Committee; 003-000-000
2018-05-18HouseAssigned to Tollway Oversight Committee
2018-05-17HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Tim Butler
2018-05-15HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-05-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Nick Sauer
2018-05-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Rita
2018-05-14HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Michelle Mussman

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback