IL HJR0132 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Parental Responsibilities and Child Support Task Force. Directs the Task Force to: review current law regarding parenting time, allocation of parental responsibilities, and child support in this State; evaluate whether the laws are implemented in a uniform and fair manner in this State; and assess the impact of the laws of this State on children and parents. Directs the Department of Healthcare and Family Services to provide administrative and other support to the Task Force. Directs the Task Force to seek voluntary assistance from educational, legal, civic, and professional organizations and institutions in its review. Directs the Task Task Force to electronically submit a report on its findings and recommendations to the General Assembly by December 31, 2018.
Title
TASK FORCE-PARENT RIGHTS STUDY
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2018-05-15 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-10 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=132&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HJR&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HJR/10000HJ0132.htm |