IL HJR0130 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-10 - Adopted Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-10 - Adopted Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
RESOLVED, BY THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES OF THE ONE HUNDREDTH GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF THE STATE OF ILLINOIS, THE SENATE CONCURRING HEREIN, that when the two Houses adjourn on Thursday, May 10, 2018, the House of Representatives stands adjourned until Tuesday, May 15, 2018 at 12:00 o'clock noon, or until the call of the Speaker; and the Senate stands adjourned until Tuesday, May 15, 2018, or until the call of the President.
Title
ADJOURN HOUSE & SENATE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-10 | House | Adopted Both Houses |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Resolution Adopted |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Prevailed to Suspend Rule 3-6(a) |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Moved to Suspend Rule Sen. Mattie Hunter; 3-6(a) |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2018-05-09 | House | Resolution Adopted |
2018-05-09 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=130&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HJR&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HJR/10000HJ0130.htm |