IL HJR0128 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 8 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-31 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-31 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
States the belief that O'Hare International Airport's noise monitoring technology should be coupled with artificial-intelligence software to match the noises perceived by each station at each time to specific individual flight operations and the operations of individual airlines and to gauge the compliance of each individual airline firm with the guidelines set down in the Fly Quiet Program. Calls for a measurable improvement in Fly Quiet compliance no later than January 1, 2017, with further improvements to follow. Urges the Aviation Department of the City of Chicago to select a trusted third party that represents the interests of O'Hare International Airport's noise neighbors and to share the information enumerated in this resolution with this third party. Urges the Aviation Department and the trusted third party to collaborate to develop a rank-ordered chart of each airline firm's compliance with Fly Quiet Program guidelines. Urges the Aviation Department and the trusted third party to give the charts explicit and formal consideration as elements in any decisions made, subsequent to the start of the generation of this data and these charts, on the reallocation of departure gates and support facilities at O'Hare International Airport.
Title
O'HARE - FLY QUIET PROGRAM
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-31 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2016-03-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Al Riley |
2016-02-23 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe |
2016-02-11 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-02-08 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Christine Winger |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=128&GAID=13&DocTypeID=HJR&SessionID=88&GA=99 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/HJR/09900HJ0128.htm |