IL HJR0128 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 18 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-11-18 - Adopted Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 18 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-11-18 - Adopted Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
RESOLVED, BY THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES OF THE NINETY-SIXTH GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF THE STATE OF ILLINOIS, THE SENATE CONCURRING HEREIN, that when the two Houses adjourn on Thursday, November 18, 2010, the House of Representatives stands adjourned until Friday, November 19, 2010, in perfunctory session; and when it adjourns on that day, it stands adjourned until Monday, November 29, 2010, at 12:00 o'clock noon; and the Senate stands adjourned until Tuesday, November 23, 2010, in perfunctory session; and when it adjourns on that day, it stands adjourned until Monday, November 29, 2010, in perfunctory session; and when it adjourns on that day, it stands adjourned until Tuesday, November 30, 2010, at 12:00 o'clock noon.
Title
ADJOURN HOUSE & SENATE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-11-18 | Adopted Both Houses | |
2010-11-18 | Resolution Adopted | |
2010-11-18 | Prevailed to Suspend Rule 3-6(a) | |
2010-11-18 | Moved to Suspend Rule Sen. Jeffrey M. Schoenberg; 3-6(a) | |
2010-11-18 | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Jeffrey M. Schoenberg | |
2010-11-18 | Arrive in Senate | |
2010-11-18 | Resolution Adopted | |
2010-11-18 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=128&GAID=10&DocTypeID=HJR&SessionID=76&GA=96 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/96/HJR/09600HJ0128.htm |