IL HJR0127 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on May 3 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-05-24 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Declares November 1, 2018 as "Vietnam Veterans Recognition Day" in the State of Illinois.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

VIETNAM VETS RECOGNITION DAY

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams
2018-05-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael D. Unes
2018-05-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin
2018-05-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Randy E. Frese
2018-05-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
2018-05-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie Phelps Finnie
2018-05-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe
2018-05-24HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Resolutions
2018-05-24HouseRecommends Be Adopted Veterans' Affairs Committee; 008-000-000
2018-05-18HouseAssigned to Veterans' Affairs Committee
2018-05-17HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II
2018-05-17HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Swanson
2018-05-17HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David Harris
2018-05-17HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2018-05-17HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Brian W. Stewart
2018-05-17HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Lou Lang
2018-05-17HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2018-05-17HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jeanne M Ives
2018-05-08HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-05-03HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Sara Wojcicki Jimenez

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback