IL HJR0127 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on May 31 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-31 - Adopted Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on May 31 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-31 - Adopted Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Directs the Bilingual Advisory Task Force (created by House Joint Resolution 36) to study the feasibility of professional certification standards for foreign language educational interpreters in public schools; if the Task Force determines that certification standards are needed, directs it to recommend procedures for school districts pertaining to when and how to access a language interpreter. Adds two additional members to the Task Force. Extends the deadline for reporting its findings and recommendations to December 15, 2016.
Title
BILINGUAL ADVISORY TASK FORCE
Sponsors
Rep. Linda LaVia [D] | Rep. Camille Lilly [D] | Rep. Mike Fortner [R] | Rep. Carol Ammons [D] |
Sen. Iris Martinez [D] | Sen. Thomas Cullerton [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-05-31 - Senate - Motion To Adopt in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-19 - House - Motion in House (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-19 - House - Motion in House (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-31 | House | Adopted Both Houses |
2016-05-31 | Senate | Resolution Adopted; 056-000-000 |
2016-05-31 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton |
2016-05-31 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions |
2016-05-31 | Senate | Be Adopted Education; 010-000-000 |
2016-05-30 | Senate | Waive Posting Notice |
2016-05-30 | Senate | Assigned to Education |
2016-05-23 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2016-05-23 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2016-05-23 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2016-05-19 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2016-05-19 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Fortner |
2016-05-19 | House | Resolution Adopted 112-000-000 |
2016-03-02 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2016-03-02 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2016-03-02 | House | Recommends Be Adopted Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 024-000-000 |
2016-02-23 | House | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee |
2016-02-11 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-02-08 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |