IL HJR0124 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 18-0)
Status: Introduced on April 26 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-05-10 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Sets forth the amounts of general funds estimated by the Illinois Senate to be available during State fiscal year 2019.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

FY19 SENATE REVENUE ESTIMATES

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie
2018-05-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas M. Bennett
2018-04-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. David S. Olsen
2018-04-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Swanson
2018-04-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Demmer
2018-04-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas Morrison
2018-04-27HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-04-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock
2018-04-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Brad Halbrook
2018-04-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin
2018-04-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven Reick
2018-04-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed
2018-04-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe
2018-04-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Lee Long
2018-04-26HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsay Parkhurst
2018-04-26HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Tim Butler
2018-04-26HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain
2018-04-26HouseChief Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith R. Wheeler
2018-04-26HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Jim Durkin

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback