IL HJR0124 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 29-4)
Status: Passed on May 31 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-31 - Adopted Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 29-4)
Status: Passed on May 31 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-31 - Adopted Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Urges Congress to re-authorize Section 4 of the Federal Voting Rights Act.
Title
VOTING RIGHTS ACT-REAUTHORIZE
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-31 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-31 | House | Adopted Both Houses |
2016-05-31 | House | House Concurs |
2016-05-31 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 116-000-000 |
2016-05-30 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-001-000 |
2016-05-30 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-05-30 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Litesa E. Wallace |
2016-05-29 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1 |
2016-05-29 | House | Arrived in House |
2016-05-27 | Senate | Resolution Adopted as Amended |
2016-05-25 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions May 26, 2016 |
2016-05-25 | Senate | Be Adopted as Amended Judiciary; 010-000-000 |
2016-05-24 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2016-05-24 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Judiciary |
2016-05-20 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2016-05-20 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Napoleon Harris, III |
2016-05-17 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary |
2016-05-09 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2016-05-05 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2016-05-04 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2016-05-04 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III |
2016-05-04 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2016-05-04 | House | Resolution Adopted |
2016-04-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2016-04-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2016-04-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2016-04-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2016-03-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Scott Drury |
2016-03-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dwight Kay |
2016-03-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Peter Breen |
2016-03-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ron Sandack |
2016-03-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elaine Nekritz |
2016-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2016-03-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis |
2016-03-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Christian L. Mitchell |
2016-03-02 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2016-03-02 | House | Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary - Civil Committee; 011-000-000 |
2016-03-01 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Pamela Reaves-Harris |
2016-03-01 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2016-03-01 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2016-03-01 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth |
2016-03-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven A. Andersson |
2016-03-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thaddeus Jones |
2016-03-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams |
2016-03-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz |
2016-03-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. André Thapedi |
2016-03-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jack D. Franks |
2016-03-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman |
2016-03-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2016-03-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Martwick |
2016-03-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Monique D. Davis |
2016-03-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2016-03-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Cynthia Soto |
2016-03-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Al Riley |
2016-02-23 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2016-02-11 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-02-03 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Litesa E. Wallace |