IL HJR0122 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Designates the East Main Street underpass of the Burlington Northern Santa Fe railroad tracks in Galesburg as the "Reverend Jon A. Sibley Sr. Underpass".
Title
JON SIBLEY SR. UNDERPASS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2018-12-30 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) January 8, 2019 |
2018-11-07 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2018-11-07 | House | Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 003-000-000 |
2018-07-02 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-24 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2018-05-24 | House | Recommends Be Adopted Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee; 013-000-000 |
2018-05-18 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee |
2018-04-24 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-23 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond |
2018-04-23 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Daniel Swanson |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=122&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HJR&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HJR/10000HJ0122.htm |