IL HJR0117 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-07-02 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Designates the section of Illinois Route 3 from Highway 156 to Vanderbrook Drive as the "Corporal Richard Lawrence Daugherty Memorial Highway".

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CPL DAUGHERTY MEMORIAL HIGHWAY

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-02HouseRule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-17HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Resolutions
2018-05-15HouseRecommends Be Adopted Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee; 011-000-000
2018-05-07HouseAssigned to Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee
2018-04-09HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-03-29HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Jerry Costello, II

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback