IL HJR0117 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on December 4 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-04 - Adopted Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on December 4 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-04 - Adopted Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
RESOLVED, BY THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES OF THE NINETY-EIGHTH GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF THE STATE OF ILLINOIS, THE SENATE CONCURRING HEREIN, that when the House of Representatives adjourns on Wednesday, December 03, 2014, it stands adjourned SINE DIE; and when the Senate adjourns on Thursday, December 04, 2014, it stands adjourned until Tuesday, January 13, 2015 at 12:00 o'clock noon, or until the call of the President; and when it adjourns on Tuesday, January 13, 2015, or if it does not convene on that day, the Senate stands adjourned SINE DIE. FURTHER RESOLVED, BY THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES OF THE NINETY-EIGHTH GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF THE STATE OF ILLINOIS, THE SENATE CONCURRING HEREIN, that when the House of Representatives adjourns SINE DIE on Wednesday, December 03, 2014, and when the Senate adjourns on Thursday, December 04, 2014 pursuant to this joint resolution, both the House of Representatives and Senate stand adjourned SINE DIE with respect to the First Special Session of the 98th General Assembly.
Title
ADJOURN HOUSE & SENATE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-04 | House | Adopted Both Houses |
2014-12-04 | Senate | Resolution Adopted |
2014-12-04 | Senate | Prevailed to Suspend Rule ; 3-6(a) |
2014-12-04 | Senate | Moved to Suspend Rule Sen. Terry Link; 3-6(a) |
2014-12-04 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Terry Link |
2014-12-04 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2014-12-03 | House | Resolution Adopted |
2014-12-03 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=117&GAID=12&DocTypeID=HJR&SessionID=85&GA=98 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/98/HJR/09800HJ0117.htm |