IL HJR0116 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on November 14 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-11-14 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Christine Winger
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Designates First Avenue in Melrose Park as it travels from its intersection with North Avenue to its intersection with River Road as the "Kiddieland Amusement Park Road".

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

KIDDIELAND AMUSEMENT PARK ROAD

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-11-14 - House - Motion in House (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-11-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Christine Winger
2018-11-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
2018-11-14HouseResolution Adopted 108-000-000
2018-11-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor All Other Democrat Members of the House
2018-11-07HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Resolutions
2018-11-07HouseApproved for Consideration Rules Committee; 003-000-000
2018-07-02HouseRule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-24HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Resolutions
2018-05-24HouseRecommends Be Adopted Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee; 013-000-000
2018-05-18HouseAssigned to Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee
2018-04-09HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-03-12HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Camille Y. Lilly

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback