IL HJR0116 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on November 14 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-11-14 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Christine Winger
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on November 14 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-11-14 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Christine Winger
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Designates First Avenue in Melrose Park as it travels from its intersection with North Avenue to its intersection with River Road as the "Kiddieland Amusement Park Road".
Title
KIDDIELAND AMUSEMENT PARK ROAD
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-11-14 - House - Motion in House (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-11-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Christine Winger |
2018-11-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2018-11-14 | House | Resolution Adopted 108-000-000 |
2018-11-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor All Other Democrat Members of the House |
2018-11-07 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2018-11-07 | House | Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 003-000-000 |
2018-07-02 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-24 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2018-05-24 | House | Recommends Be Adopted Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee; 013-000-000 |
2018-05-18 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee |
2018-04-09 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-03-12 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |