IL HJR0115 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 10 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-05-31 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Urges the U.S. Department of Education to actively sustain the school discipline guidance released by the Departments of Education and Justice in 2014, and the State of Illinois and Illinois State Board of Education to uphold the original school discipline guidance released by the Department of Education and Justice in 2014, regardless of the decision made by the U.S. Department of Education.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SCHOOL DISCIPLINE GUIDANCE

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-31SenateResolution Adopted
2018-05-29SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt
2018-05-29SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions May 30, 2018
2018-05-29SenateBe Adopted Education; 009-000-000
2018-05-29SenateWaive Posting Notice
2018-05-24SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Scott M. Bennett
2018-05-23SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Kwame Raoul
2018-05-21SenateAssigned to Education
2018-05-10SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
2018-05-10SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-05-10SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino
2018-05-10SenateArrive in Senate
2018-05-10HouseResolution Adopted
2018-04-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
2018-04-19HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Resolutions
2018-04-18HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2018-04-18HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2018-04-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy
2018-04-18HouseRecommends Be Adopted Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 016-000-000
2018-04-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
2018-04-03HouseAssigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee
2018-03-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregory Harris
2018-03-08HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-03-07HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Sonya M. Harper

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback