IL HJR0113 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-01 - Adopted Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-01 - Adopted Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
RESOLVED, BY THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES OF THE ONE HUNDREDTH GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF THE STATE OF ILLINOIS, THE SENATE CONCURRING HEREIN, that when the two Houses adjourn on Thursday, March 01, 2018, the House of Representatives stands adjourned until Tuesday, March 06, 2018, and when it adjourns on that day, it stands adjourned until Wednesday, March 07, 2018, and when it adjourns on that day, it stands adjourned until Thursday, March 08, 2018, and when it adjourns on that day, it stands adjourned until April 9, 2018 at 12 Noon, or until the call of the Speaker; and the Senate stands adjourned until Tuesday, March 13, 2018, and when it adjourns on that day, it stands adjourned until Wednesday, March 14, 2018, and when it adjourns on that day, it stands adjourned until Thursday, March 15, 2018, and when it adjourns on that day, it stands adjourned until Tuesday, April 10, 2018, or until the call of the President.
Title
ADJOURN HOUSE & SENATE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-01 | House | Adopted Both Houses |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Resolution Adopted |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Prevailed to Suspend Rule 3-6(a) |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Moved to Suspend Rule Sen. Terry Link; 3-6(a) |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Terry Link |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2018-03-01 | House | Resolution Adopted |
2018-03-01 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=113&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HJR&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HJR/10000HJ0113.htm |