IL HJR0110 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-3)
Status: Engrossed on May 10 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-07-01 - Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Urges more money to be allocated from the Federal Aviation Administration Passenger Facility Charge for the purpose of community airport noise mitigation and community airport air quality monitoring and toxic emissions reduction.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

ENVIRONMENTAL MITIGATION

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-01SenatePursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
2018-05-24SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions May 25, 2018
2018-05-24SenateBe Adopted as Amended Transportation; 011-000-000
2018-05-24SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2018-05-24SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Transportation
2018-05-24SenateWaive Posting Notice
2018-05-23SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-05-23SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Thomas Cullerton
2018-05-22SenateAssigned to Transportation
2018-05-15SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-05-15SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton
2018-05-15SenateArrive in Senate
2018-05-10HouseResolution Adopted
2018-04-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. André Thapedi
2018-04-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan
2018-04-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe
2018-04-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. David Harris
2018-04-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico
2018-04-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis
2018-04-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman
2018-04-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Martwick
2018-04-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Luis Arroyo
2018-04-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Al Riley
2018-04-19HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Resolutions
2018-04-17HouseRecommends Be Adopted Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee; 010-000-000
2018-04-03HouseAssigned to Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee
2018-02-27HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-15HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Christine Winger

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback